Matthias Paul et al v. Alda Events B.V.
Petitioner: MATTHIAS PAUL and PAUL VAN DYK GmbH
Respondent: ALDA EVENTS B.V.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04280
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED that: (1) the hearing on the Petition to Confirm will be continued from July 22, 2019 to August 5, 2019 at 1:30 p.m.; (2) Respondents Opposition to the Petition to Confirm shall be filed no later than July 15, 2019; and (3) Petitioners Reply shall be filed no later than July 22, 2019. (yl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Petition from July 22, 2019 to August 5, 2019 Re: PETITION for Order for Confirmation of Arbitration Award #11 filed by Respondent Alda Events B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Fox, #2 Declaration of Marisol Mork, #3 Proposed Order)(Fox, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH, re Sealed Document, #16 served on June 27, 2019. (Chieffo, Vincent)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Vincent H. Chieffo re PETITION for Order for Confirmation of Arbitration Award #11 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #15 filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH.(Chieffo, Vincent)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #12 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #13 served on June 24, 2019. (Chieffo, Vincent)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 and 2 to Vincent H. Chieffo Declaration ISO Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award under seal #12 filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1 to Chieffo Declaration ISO Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2 to Chieffo Declaration ISO Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award)(Chieffo, Vincent)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 and 2 to Vincent H. Chieffo Declaration ISO Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award under seal filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent H. Chieffo, #2 Redacted Document 1 to Chieffo Declaration ISO Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, #3 Redacted Document 2 to Chieffo Declaration ISO Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, #4 Proposed Order)(Chieffo, Vincent)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 PETITION for Order for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent H. Chieffo, #2 Exhibit 1-14 to Chieffo Declaration, #3 Exhibit 15-18 to Chieffo Declaration, #4 Declaration of Niklas Conrad, #5 Declaration of Jasper van Gameren, #6 Proposed Order) (Chieffo, Vincent)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH, identifying none. (Chieffo, Vincent)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vincent Henry Chieffo counsel for Petitioners Matthias Paul, Paul Van Dyk GmbH. Adding Vincent H. Chieffo as counsel of record for Matthias Paul p/k/a Paul van Dyk and Paul van Dyk GmbH for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Petitioners Matthias Paul p/k/a Paul van Dyk and Paul van Dyk GmbH. (Chieffo, Vincent)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference set for 6/24/2019 is vacated and off-calendar. The deadline for the parties to file motions to confirm or vacate the arbitrator's award is July 22, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 6/24/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PETITION for Confirmation of Contractual Arbitration Award filed against Alda Events B.V., filed by Petitioners Paul Van Dyk GmbH, Matthias Paul. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Respondent ALDA EVENTS B.V.. (Fox, Adam)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Respondent ALDA EVENTS B.V., identifying Nationale Nederlanden NV. (Fox, Adam)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCP00146 Receipt No: 0973-23754792 - Fee: $400, filed by Respondent ALDA EVENTS B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 of 5, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 of 5, #4 Exhibit B Part 3 of 5, #5 Exhibit B Part 4 of 5, #6 Exhibit B Part 5 of 5, #7 Appendix) (Attorney Adam R Fox added to party ALDA EVENTS B.V.(pty:res))(Fox, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthias Paul et al v. Alda Events B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALDA EVENTS B.V.
Represented By: Adam R Fox
Represented By: Marisol C Mork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MATTHIAS PAUL
Represented By: Vincent Henry Chieffo
Represented By: Jamie D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAUL VAN DYK GmbH
Represented By: Vincent Henry Chieffo
Represented By: Jamie D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?