Connie Dietrich v. Autozone West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dietrich Connie and Connie Dietrich
Defendant: Autozone West, Inc., The Boeing Company, Borgwarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-By-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, -, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc., SOCO West, Inc., The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Metaclad Insulation Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Masoneilan International Inc., Western Auto Supply Company, Metalclad Insulation LLC, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Does 1 through 400, inclusive, Honeywell International Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, AutoZone, Metalclad Insulation Corporation and AutoZone, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04291
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 39 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration In Support of re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,,,,,, #35 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #38 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Exhibit 13-26, #3 Exhibit 27-31, #4 Exhibit 32-39, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 41-42, #7 Exhibit 43-46, #8 Exhibit 47-58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, Part 1/3, #11 Exhibit 60, Part 2/3, #12 Exhibit 60 Part 3/3, #13 Exhibit 61-71, #14 Exhibit 72-74, #15 Exhibit 75, #16 Exhibit 76-79, #17 Exhibit 80, #18 Exhibit 81-83, #19 Exhibit 84, Part 1/2, #20 Exhibit 84, Part 2/2, #21 Exhibit 85, Part 1/2, #22 Exhibit 85, Part 2/2, #23 Exhibit 86, Part 1/6, #24 Exhibit 86, Part 2/6, #25 Exhibit 86, Part 3/6, #26 Exhibit 86, Part 4/6, #27 Exhibit 86, Part 5/6, #28 Exhibit 86, Part 6/6, #29 Exhibit 87-92, #30 Exhibit 93-94, #31 Exhibit 95, #32 Exhibit 96, #33 Exhibit 97, #34 Exhibit 98-99, #35 Exhibit 100, Part 1/3, #36 Exhibit 100, Part 2/3, #37 Exhibit 100, Part 3/3, #38 Exhibit 101-105, #39 Exhibit 106, Part 1/2, #40 Exhibit 106, Part 2/2, #41 Exhibit 107-109, #42 Exhibit 110-112, #43 Exhibit 113-14)(Young, Kristi)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DKT. 36) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: See order for details. (shb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 37 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Larry L. Fogg under seal #36 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Exhibit 13-26, #3 Exhibit 27-31, #4 Exhibit 32-39, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 41-42, #7 Exhibit 43-46, #8 Exhibit 47-58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, Part 1/3, #11 Exhibit 60, Part 2/3, #12 Exhibit 60, Part 3/3, #13 Exhibit 61-71, #14 Exhibit 72-74, #15 Exhibit 75, #16 Exhibit 76-79, #17 Exhibit 80, #18 Exhibit 81-83, #19 Exhibit 84, Part 1/2, #20 Exhibit 84, Part 2/2, #21 Exhibit 85, Part 1/2, #22 Exhibit 85, Part 2/2, #23 Exhibit 86, Part 1/6, #24 Exhibit 86, Part 2/6, #25 Exhibit 86, Part 3/6, #26 Exhibit 86, Part 4/6, #27 Exhibit 86, Part 5/6, #28 Exhibit 86, Part 6/6, #29 Exhibit 87-92, #30 Exhibit 93-94, #31 Exhibit 95, #32 Exhibit 96, #33 Exhibit 97, #34 Exhibit 98-99, #35 Exhibit 100, Part 1/3, #36 Exhibit 100, Part 2/3, #37 Exhibit 100, Part 3/3, #38 Exhibit 101-105, #39 Exhibit 106, Part 1/2, #40 Exhibit 106, Part 2/2, #41 Exhibit 107-109, #42 Exhibit 110-112, #43 Exhibit 113-114)(Young, Kristi)
July 2, 2019 Filing 36 APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Larry L. Fogg under seal filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF KRISTI L.K. YOUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, #2 Declaration OF LARRY L. FOGG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #3 Exhibit 1-50 to Fogg Declaration, #4 Exhibit 51-59 to Fogg Declaration, #5 Exhibit 60, Part 1/3 to Fogg Declaration, #6 Exhibit 60, Part 2/3 to Fogg Declaration, #7 Exhibit 60, Part 3/3 to Fogg Declaration, #8 Exhibit 61-100 to Fogg Declaration, #9 Exhibit 101-110 to Fogg Declaration, #10 Exhibit 111-114 to Fogg Declaration, #11 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL)(Young, Kristi)
July 2, 2019 Filing 35 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #32 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF KRISTI L.K. YOUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 4-Part 1 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 4-Part 2 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4-Part 3 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 4-Part 4 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 4-Part 5 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Exhibit 4-Part 6 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #9 Exhibit 4-Part 7 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #10 Exhibit 4-Part 8 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #11 Exhibit 4-Part 9 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 Exhibit 4-Part 10 of 10 to Declaration of Kristi L.K. Young ISO Boeing's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Young, Kristi)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. KronstadtHearing: September 16, 2019 at 8:30 am. Joint Report Due: September 6, 2019. This case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order applies to all parties in this action, whether or not they are represented by counsel. Counsel, as used in this Order, also refers to parties who are representing themselves. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on each defendant, plaintiff shall promptly do so and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Defendant(s) also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. (shb)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (DKT. #32 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from September 30, 2019 to September 16, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Standing Order with respect to the briefing of motions. The Motion will be advanced if an earlier date becomes available on the Court's motion calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 14, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Connie Dietrich. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Stock, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Tyler Robert Stock added to party Connie Dietrich(pty:pla)) (Stock, Tyler)
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. (Alberts, Patricia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California, identifying The Pep Boys Manny, Moe & Jack of California. (Alberts, Patricia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patricia Elana Ball Alberts counsel for Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. Adding Patricia Ball Alberts as counsel of record for The Pep Boys Manny, Moe & Jack of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Pep Boys Manny, Moe & Jack of California. (Attorney Patricia Elana Ball Alberts added to party The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California(pty:dft))(Alberts, Patricia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. Adding Bradford J. DeJardin as counsel of record for The Pep Boys Manny, Moe & Jack of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Pep Boys Manny, Moe & Jack of California. (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California(pty:dft))(DeJardin, Bradford)
May 29, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC's Notice of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (DeJardin, Bradford)
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine C Elford on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Attorney Katherine C Elford added to party Honeywell International Inc.(pty:dft))(Elford, Katherine)
May 29, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC, identifying Metalclad Insulation LLC. (DeJardin, Bradford)
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint)(Elford, Katherine)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patricia Elana Ball Alberts counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Patricia Ball Alberts as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Patricia Elana Ball Alberts added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Alberts, Patricia)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Bradford J. DeJardin as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(DeJardin, Bradford)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ISO Notice of Re-Filing Answer to State Court Complaint)(Gilefsky, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, identifying The Dow Chemical Company. (Gilefsky, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Susan W Gilefsky on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (Attorney Susan W Gilefsky added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(Gilefsky, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT of Consent or Declination to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant The Boeing Company (Karren, Brent)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company, identifying Advance Stores Company Inc.. (Glinka, Patrick)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Defendant Western Auto Supply Company's Notice of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Western Auto Supply Company's Notice of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Western Auto Supply Company's Notice of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial)(Glinka, Patrick)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dana L Burch counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Dana L. Burch as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis D Pond counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Frank D. Pond as counsel of record for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Graham counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Michael A. Graham as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick J Glinka counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Patrick J. Glinka as counsel of record for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Patrick J Glinka added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Glinka, Patrick)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Hearing: No Hearing/Under Submission. Joint Report Due: July 26, 2019. This case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order applies to all parties in this action, whether or not they are represented by counsel. Counsel, as used in this Order, also refers to parties who are representing themselves. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on each defendant, plaintiff shall promptly do so and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Defendant(s) also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. See order for details. (shb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. See order for details. (shb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 3. The correct event is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brent Marshall Karren counsel for Defendant The Boeing Company. Adding Brent M. Karren as counsel of record for The Boeing Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attorney Brent Marshall Karren added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Karren, Brent)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Electronic Filing re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Notice (Other) #3 e-mailed to Kristi L. YOung bounced due to invalid email address. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to kyoung@mgmlaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Autozone West, Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/23/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/9/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3)(lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/23/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Autozone West, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3)(Attorney William L Coggshall added to party Autozone West, Inc.(pty:dft))(lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Autozone West, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Honeywell International Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc., Masoneilan International Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Owens-Illinois, Inc., SOCO West, Inc., The Boeing Company, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Union Carbide Corporation, Western Auto Supply Company, Does 1 through 400. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/11/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
May 16, 2019 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Masoneilan International Inc. served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fred Monia, Agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3)(lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Union Carbide Corporation served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/23/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pat T., Mailing Room Supervisor in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3)(lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant SOCO West, Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lupe Mendoza, Secretary, authorized to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Honeywell International Inc. served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Western Auto Supply Company served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc., Agent for service by serving Frances Burris in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Dietrich, upon Defendant The Boeing Company served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/09/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties, Rule 7.1 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Young, Kristi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Young, Kristi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior, County of Los Angeles, case number 18STCV00436 Receipt No: 0973-23755502 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Dietrich Complaint and Preliminary Fact Sheet REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B-Paul Dietrich's Mil Recs REDACTED, #3 Exhibit C--ALL Process, Orders, Filings, #4 Exhibit D-1.17.19 Boeing-Disco to Plf Set-One, #5 Exhibit E-verified 2.20.19 Resp, #6 Exhibit F- 4.19.19 Resp, #7 Exhibit G-Vol 1 Connie, #8 Exhibit H-Vol 2 Connie, #9 Exhibit I-Vol 3 Connie, #10 Exhibit J-Sheri Pope, #11 Exhibit K-Mike Dietrich, #12 Exhibit L-- James Dietrich, #13 Exhibit M-Dietrich 11.8.18 Plf Res to STANDARD ROGS, #14 Exhibit N-Dietrich C 11.28.18 Plf CORRECTED Res to STANDARD ROGS, #15 Exhibit O-CaseManagementStandingOrderReDiscoveryinallCoordinatedLAOSDCases081114) (Attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Young, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connie Dietrich v. Autozone West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone West, Inc.
Represented By: William L Coggshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Kristi Leigh Kasey Young
Represented By: Brent Marshall Karren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-By-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCO West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metaclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masoneilan International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Patrick J Glinka
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Patricia Elana Ball Alberts
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California
Represented By: Patricia Elana Ball Alberts
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 400, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Susan W Gilefsky
Represented By: Mary Therese McKelvey
Represented By: Ryan S Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone
Represented By: William L Coggshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Patricia Elana Ball Alberts
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By: William L Coggshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dietrich Connie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Dietrich
Represented By: Benno B Ashrafi
Represented By: Marc Ian Willick
Represented By: Tyler Robert Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?