Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company v. Marisa Davey et al

Plaintiff: Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ryan Davey and Marisa Davey
Case Number: 2:2019cv04293
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge John A. Kronstadt, ORDERING No Title - Letter/Answer dated June 24, 2019 to Clerk of Court from Marisa Davey, et al submitted by Defendants Marisa Davey, Ryan Davey received on June 27, 2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Lacking name, address, phone, facsimile numbers, and e-mail address. The document appears to be an answer to the Complaint. However, it is not in compliance with the Local Rules. The Clerk shall return the documents via U.S. Mail to Defendant. Defendant shall resubmit the document for filing consistent with the Local Rules. Defendant may also refer to the Pro Se Clinic for assistance at: http//prose,cacd,uscourts.gov/?OpenDocument. (shb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. See order for details. (shb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ryan Davey. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Marisa Davey. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company identifying Pan-American Life Insurance Group, Inc., a subsidiary of Pan-American Life Mutual Holding Company as Corporate Parent. (Chadwick, Cristyn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company, identifying Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company, Pan-American Life Insurance Group, Inc., Pan-American Life Mutual Holding Company, Marisa Davey, Ryan Davey. (Chadwick, Cristyn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company. (Chadwick, Cristyn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company. (Chadwick, Cristyn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company. (Chadwick, Cristyn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23755802 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Cristyn N Chadwick added to party Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Chadwick, Cristyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company v. Marisa Davey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mutual Trust Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristyn N Chadwick
Represented By: Thomas A Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?