Brian Whitaker v. HKJ Gold, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Sami K. Jarjour and HKJ Gold, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04294
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Defendant HKJ Gold, Inc. This case is referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 2. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 9/30/2019. (lom)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant HKJ Gold, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Application for Stay and Early Mediation) (Ensberg, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HKJ Gold, Inc., identifying Jeff Gold, President of HKJ Gold, Inc., Defendant.. (Ensberg, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant HKJ Gold, Inc..(Attorney Stephen E Ensberg added to party HKJ Gold, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ensberg, Stephen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Sami K. Jarjour served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tobin Oconnor - Co-resident in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant HKJ Gold, Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ash S Assistant - Supervisor in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants HKJ Gold, Inc., Sami K. Jarjour. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23756079 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. HKJ Gold, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami K. Jarjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKJ Gold, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E Ensberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?