Delmar Schmidtberger v. Western Refining Retail, LLC et al

Plaintiff: DELMAR SCHMIDTBERGER
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, Western Refining Retail, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04300
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC.(Rusche, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Delmar Schmidtberger(Adolph, Launa)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-05768 VAP(SKx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04300 VAP(SKx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC's Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC identifying Western Refining Southwest, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rusche, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on August 8, 2019. (gga)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Western Refining Retail LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC.(Attorney Timothy M Rusche added to party Western Refining Retail, LLC(pty:dft))(Rusche, Timothy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-05768; 2:19-cv-00855 (Rusche, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Delmar Schmidtberger, upon Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT CORPORATION SYSTEM in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Adolph, Launa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC. (jp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jp)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DELMAR SCHMIDTBERGER, (Adolph, Launa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff DELMAR SCHMIDTBERGER. (Adolph, Launa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DELMAR SCHMIDTBERGER. (Adolph, Launa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23757638 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff DELMAR SCHMIDTBERGER. (Attorney Launa Adolph added to party DELMAR SCHMIDTBERGER(pty:pla))(Adolph, Launa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delmar Schmidtberger v. Western Refining Retail, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELMAR SCHMIDTBERGER
Represented By: Launa Adolph
Represented By: Matthew John Matern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Refining Retail, LLC
Represented By: Michael W Kopp
Represented By: Timothy M Rusche
Represented By: William J Dritsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?