BASF Corporation v. Als Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc.
Plaintiff: BASF Corporation
Defendant: Al's Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc. d/b/a and/or a/k/a Al's Body Shop and Als Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04306
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BASF Corporation, upon Defendant Als Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc. served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Idelsis Geldhof, Secretary in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bailey, Bobbie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Als Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc. (car)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BASF Corporation. (Bailey, Bobbie)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff BASF Corporation identifying BASF Americas Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Bailey, Bobbie)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BASF Corporation. (Bailey, Bobbie)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23759460 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requirements Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter) (Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party BASF Corporation(pty:pla))(Bailey, Bobbie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASF Corporation v. Als Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al's Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc. d/b/a and/or a/k/a Al's Body Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Als Body Shop of Huntington Park, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Thi H Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?