Brianna Rivera v. JHB Companies LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brianna Rivera
Defendant: JHB Companies LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04311
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Brianna Rivera. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #17 , by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation is GRANTED. Defendant's answer, motion, or other pleading in response to the complaint is hereby extended until 14 days after the Courts decision on plaintiff's response to the show-cause order. (bm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant JHB Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gott, Aaron)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JURISDICTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, no later than July 12, 2019, why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See document for further details) (es)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Appearance #10 by clerk. The document is accepted as filed. (lom)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #12 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation is GRANTED. Defendant's answer, motion, or other pleading in response to the complaint is hereby extended until July 11, 2019. (lom)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #11 , Notice of Appearance #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JHB Companies LLC answer now due 7/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant JHB Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gott, Aaron)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aaron Gott on behalf of Defendant JHB Companies LLC (Attorney Aaron Gott added to party JHB Companies LLC(pty:dft))(Gott, Aaron)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jarod Michael Bona on behalf of Defendant JHB Companies LLC (Attorney Jarod Michael Bona added to party JHB Companies LLC(pty:dft))(Bona, Jarod)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brianna Rivera, upon Defendant JHB Companies LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Millaneia Jones, employee authorized to accept service on behalf of Jonathan Beskin, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ferrell, Scott)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant JHB Companies LLC. (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brianna Rivera. (Ferrell, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brianna Rivera, (Ferrell, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brianna Rivera. (Ferrell, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23759148 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Brianna Rivera. (Attorney Scott J Ferrell added to party Brianna Rivera(pty:pla))(Ferrell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brianna Rivera v. JHB Companies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHB Companies LLC
Represented By: Aaron Gott
Represented By: Jarod Michael Bona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Rivera
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?