Eva Osella v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Eva Osella
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04318
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Newman, Stephen)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Stipulation is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc. to respond to the Complaint, by answer, motion or otherwise, shall be extended to and including June 28, 2019. (lom)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc. answer now due 6/28/2019; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer now due 6/28/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. Newman, #2 Proposed Order)(Newman, Stephen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Newman, Stephen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc. answer now due 6/14/2019; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer now due 6/14/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Newman, Stephen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Eva Osella. (Filed in state court 4/18/2019, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on May 17, 2019. (Newman, Stephen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Newman, Stephen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Newman, Stephen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV13525 Receipt No: 0973-23760559 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Stephen J Newman added to party J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Newman added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Newman, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eva Osella v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J Newman
Represented By: Julia B Strickland
Represented By: David W Moon
Represented By: Adam Philip Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Stephen J Newman
Represented By: Julia B Strickland
Represented By: David W Moon
Represented By: Adam Philip Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Osella
Represented By: Timothy G Blood
Represented By: Aleksandr J Yarmolinets
Represented By: Daniel R Forde
Represented By: Aaron F Hughes
Represented By: Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?