1127 Crenshaw, LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, et al
Plaintiff: 1127 Crenshaw, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04327
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Standing Order filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Agness, Aaron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Re Notice to Adverse Parties served on May 20, 2019. (Agness, Aaron)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff 1127 Crenshaw, LLC. (Filed in state court 2/26/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, identifying Travelers Casualty and Surety Company; Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc.; Travelers Property Casualty Corp.; The Travelers Companies, Inc. (defendant's corporate parents); and, Eunice Kim (Plaintiff's member). (Ashley, Leo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Leo L. Ashley III re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ashley, Leo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV06734 Receipt No: 0973-23763269 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 State Court - Summons, #2 State Court - Complaint, #3 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum, #5 State Court - Notice of Case Assignment, #6 State Court - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations Packet, #7 State Court - ADR Information Packet, #8 State Court - CSC's Notice of Service of Process) (Attorney Leo L Ashley, III added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ashley, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1127 Crenshaw, LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1127 Crenshaw, LLC
Represented By: Edward J Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Leo L Ashley, III
Represented By: Aaron C Agness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?