Tramon Wilson-Davis v. SSP America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tramon Wilson-Davis
Defendant: SSP America, Inc., SSP America LAX, LLC and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04375
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II :On the Courts own motion, the Court CONTINUES the hearings on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #14 , currently set for hearing on July 15, 2019, and Defendants Motion to Dismiss #16 , currently set for hearing on July 22, 2019, to August 12, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. (lc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY Reply in Support of a Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) #16 Defendants' Reply In Support of It's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of It's Motion to Dismiss)(Hayes, Christina)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) #16 filed by Plaintiff Tramon Wilson-Davis. (Kwak, Simon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 filed by Plaintiff Tramon Wilson-Davis. (Kwak, Simon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 Defendants Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Action to State Court filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. (Hayes, Christina)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christina H. Hayes, #3 Declaration of Lieske Renz, #4 Proposed Order) (Hayes, Christina)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. correcting Declaration #4 of Pat Banducci in Support of Defendants SSP America, Inc. and SSP America LAX, LLCs Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court (Hayes, Christina)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Tramon Wilson-Davis. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Kwak, Simon)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SSP America LAX, LLC answer now due 6/18/2019; SSP America, Inc. answer now due 6/18/2019, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #12 filed by Defendant SSP America LAX, LLC; SSP America, Inc..(Hayes, Christina)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SSP America LAX, LLC answer now due 6/11/2019; SSP America, Inc. answer now due 6/11/2019, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC; SSP America, Inc..(Hayes, Christina)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Tramon Wilson-Davis, upon Defendant SSP America, Inc. served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service Albert Damonte in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/25/19 Submitted as attachment 6 to Declaration Doc. #3 (car)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Tramon Wilson-Davis, upon Defendant SSP America LAX, LLC served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service Albert Damonte in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/25/19 Submitted as attachment 6 to Declaration Doc. #3 (car) Modified on 5/22/2019 (car).
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Tramon Wilson-Davis. Filed in State Court on 3/13/19 Submitted as attachment 1 to Declaration Doc. #3 (car)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #7 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 , Declaration,, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Declaration #4 Declaration of Denise Visconti #3 and Declaration of Pat Banducci #4 served on May 20, 2019. (Hayes, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. (Hayes, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc., identifying SSP America, Inc.; SSP America LAX, LLC, Tramon Wilson-Davis. (Hayes, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc. (Hayes, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Pat Banducci re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. (Hayes, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Denise M. Visconti re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Case Assignment, Blank Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations, Alternative Dispute Resolution Information Package, #3 Exhibit C - Inititial Status Conference Order, #4 Exhibit D - Challenge to Judicial Officer, #5 Exhibit E - Minute Order - Case Deemed Complex, #6 Exhibit F - Proofs of Service of Summons, #7 Exhibit G - Minute Order - Peremptory Challenge Granted)(Hayes, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. (Hayes, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV08579 Receipt No: 0973-23772702 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants SSP America LAX, LLC, SSP America, Inc.. (Attorney Christina H Hayes added to party SSP America LAX, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christina H Hayes added to party SSP America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hayes, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tramon Wilson-Davis v. SSP America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSP America, Inc.
Represented By: Christina H Hayes
Represented By: Denise M Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSP America LAX, LLC
Represented By: Christina H Hayes
Represented By: Denise M Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tramon Wilson-Davis
Represented By: Simon Kwak
Represented By: Samuel A Wong
Represented By: Jessica L Campbell
Represented By: Kashif Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?