Frances J. Capasso v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Frances J. Capasso
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv04376
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Frances J. Capasso, re Order #9 served on 6/5/19. (Lowenstein, Janna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frances J. Capasso, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/5/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. Dela Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lowenstein, Janna)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-4376 FFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by p Frances J. Capasso. (Lowenstein, Janna)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: (see attached order) (jm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (jm)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IFP by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting #4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (jm)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Frances J. Capasso. (Lowenstein, Janna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Frances J. Capasso. (Lowenstein, Janna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frances J. Capasso, identifying United States Social Security Administration. (Lowenstein, Janna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frances J. Capasso. (Lowenstein, Janna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Frances J. Capasso. (Attorney Janna K Lowenstein added to party Frances J. Capasso(pty:pla))(Lowenstein, Janna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frances J. Capasso v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances J. Capasso
Represented By: Janna K Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?