Manuel L. Triana v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Manuel L. Triana
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv04397
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Manuel L. Triana, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. De La Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to no name listed. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (hr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. This Amended Case Management Order supersedes the prior Order re Procedures in Social Security Appeal #5 . (see document for further details) (hr)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Manuel L. Triana. (esa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (esa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early.(Filing fee $400 paid), filed by plaintiff Manuel L. Triana. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel L. Triana v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel L. Triana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?