Michelle Christian Honse et al v. Ignacio Mora

Plaintiff: Michelle Christian Honse
Defendant: Ignacio O. Mora
Not Yet Classified: Robert Wilkie
Case Number: 2:2019cv04432
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse, re Declaration #16 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition #15 served on 7/8/2019. (es)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION In Support of Motion to request accommodation Plaintiffs declaration, and plaintiffs motion to request leave Opposition to Order #15 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse. (es)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiffs Opposition to Order Plaintiffs motion to request accommodation, plaintiffs declaration and plaintiffs motion to request leave filed by plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(es)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss #9 by Judge James V. Selna: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the motion to dismiss. The motion is granted with prejudice, and without leave to amend. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter, and the July 8, 2019 hearing is vacated. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (See document for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (es)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Lisa Holliday in Support Thereof #9 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Real Party In Interest Defendant Robert Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Han, Chung)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 08/05/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 07/29/2019. (lb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse, re Declaration #10 served on 6/3/2019. (es)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse. (es)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Lisa Holliday in Support Thereof filed by Real Party-Defendant in Interest Robert Wilkie. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Real Party-Defendant in Interest Robert Wilkie's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proof of Service) (Han, Chung)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse, re REQUEST for Order for Clarification #7 served on 5/28/2019. (es)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clarification Declaration, Plaintiff Opposition to Defendants Notice of Removal Civil Action filed by plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse. (es)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-02000 JVS(DFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge George H. Wu to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04432 JVS(DFMx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF (REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS) COMPLAINT against Defendant Ignacio O. Mora., filed by plaintiff Michelle Christian Honse. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1-2) (ghap)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Real Party In Interest Defendant Robert Wilkie. (Han, Chung)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19LBR000797 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Real Party-Defendant in interest Robert Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party Robert Wilkie(pty:rpid))(Han, Chung)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelle Christian Honse et al v. Ignacio Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Robert Wilkie
Represented By: Chung Hae Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Christian Honse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignacio O. Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?