David Daryl Jones v. Gabriela Vargas et al
Plaintiff: David Daryl Jones
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Vargas Gabriela, Gabriela Vargas and Does 1 to 15
Case Number: 2:2019cv04440
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gabriela Vargas. (Attorney William E Ireland added to party Gabriela Vargas(pty:dft))(Ireland, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., AND GABRIELAVARGAS'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF #11 filed by Plaintiff David Daryl Jones. (shb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR REMAND OF THIS CASE TO STATE COURT (DKT. #14 ); NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND FILED IN STATE COURT WITH ITS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (DKT. #15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Request for Extension is MOOT. Any opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand shall be filed on or before July 17, 2019. Any reply shall be filed on or before August 14, 2019. The motion to remand is set for a hearing on October 21, 2019, at 8:30 a.m., to be heard with Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #11 ). See Dkt. #13 (setting hearing date for motion to dismiss). Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss remains due on July 8, 2019, with a reply to be filed by July 22, 2019. The motions will be advanced if an earlier date becomes available. (ake)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #16 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (hr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND FILED IN STATE COURT WITH ITS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION WHICH WAS ALSO FILED IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION filed by Plaintiff David Daryl Jones. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (shb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff David Daryl Jones. (shb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR REMAND OF THIS CASE TO STATE COURT filed by Plaintiff David Daryl Jones. (shb)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNTAIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (DKT. #11 , 12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues Defendant's Motion from September 30, 2019 to October 21, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion no later than July 8, 2019, with Defendant to file a reply by July 22, 2019. The Motion will be advanced if an earlier date becomes available. (ake)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNTAIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (DKT. #11 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from September 30, 2019 to October 21, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Motion will be advanced if an earlier date becomes available. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ireland, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Order,, #8 , Order, Set/Reset Deadlines #9 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 served on May 28, 2019. (Ireland, William)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Scheduling Conference Hearing: No Hearing / Under Submission; Joint Report Due: August 2, 2019. (lom)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (lom)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 TO 15, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Gabriela Vargas. Filed by Plaintiff David Daryl Jones. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/22/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying David Daryl Jones, Gabriela Vargas, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ireland, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Related Case(s): none (Ireland, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ireland, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of William E. Ireland re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ireland, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19CMCV00141 Receipt No: 0973-23784627 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney William E Ireland added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Ireland, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Daryl Jones v. Gabriela Vargas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William E Ireland
Represented By: Tristan Christopher Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vargas Gabriela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriela Vargas
Represented By: William E Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Daryl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?