De'Jah Smith v. Patina Restaurant Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: De'Jah Smith
Defendant: Patina Restaurant Group, LLC, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive, and Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04441
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #14 filed by Plaintiff De'Jah Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Declaration of Roman Otkupman In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #3 Certificate of Service)(Otkupman, Roman)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference #15 . Scheduling Conference continued to 8/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (twdb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Initial Status Conference from July 8, 2019 to August 5, 2019 filed by Plaintiff De'Jah Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Otkupman, Roman)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Fontaine Yuk, #3 Declaration of Melissa Runfola, #4 Proposed Order) (Yuk, Fontaine)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff De'Jah Smith.. (Otkupman, Roman)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 8, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 24, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. (lom)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial De'Jah Smith.. (Otkupman, Roman)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Yuk, Fontaine)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC. Filed in State Court on 5/21/19 Submitted with Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Patina Restaurant Group, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff De'Jah Smith. Filed in State Court on 4/15/2019 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on May 22, 2019. (Yuk, Fontaine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Susan Scott re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC. (Yuk, Fontaine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC (Yuk, Fontaine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC, identifying De'Jah Smith, Patina Restaurant Group, LLC, Restaurant Hospitality LLC, DNC Landmark Holdings, LLC, Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. (Yuk, Fontaine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC. (Yuk, Fontaine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV13012 Receipt No: 0973-23784728 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Patina Restaurant Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Fontaine Yuk added to party Patina Restaurant Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Yuk, Fontaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De'Jah Smith v. Patina Restaurant Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patina Restaurant Group, LLC
Represented By: Fontaine Yuk
Represented By: Joshua A Rodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Jah Smith
Represented By: Roman Otkupman
Represented By: Meghan Sherry Maertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?