Brando Piggue v. Project Resources Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Piggue
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,, Project Resources Group, Inc. and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04452
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc., re Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1) #12 served on July 3, 2019. (Tobias, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.(Tobias, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc... (Tobias, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Order re Notice to Counsel [Docket 9 Issued June 5, 2019] filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.. (Tobias, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Order filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.. re Notice to Counsel (Tobias, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.. (Tobias, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/21/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT F-45)(ghap)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brandon Piggue, upon Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc. served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Megan Isner, Northwest Registered Agents, Inc.-Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT E-43) (ghap)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100 inclusive, Project Resources Group, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Brandon Piggue. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc., re Errata, #4 served on May 22, 2019. (Tobias, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal Filed 5-22-2019 - Notice of Case Management Conference, #2 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal Filed 5-22-2019 - Proof of Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal Filed 5-22-2019 - Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Tobias, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Brando Piggue; Counsel for Plaintiff Imad Y. Elias and Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.. (Tobias, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.. (Tobias, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV12361 Receipt No: 0973-23786427 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Project Resources Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons (Superior Court), #2 Exhibit B - Complaint (Superior Court), #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet (Superior Court), #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Case Assignment (Superior Court), #5 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference (Superior Court), #6 Exhibit F - Answer to Unverified Complaint (Superior Court), #7 Declaration of Matthew A. Tobias In Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal, #8 Declaration of Dean Flora in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Matthew A Tobias added to party Project Resources Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tobias, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brando Piggue v. Project Resources Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A Tobias
Represented By: Aracely Abarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Piggue
Represented By: Nina Ardalan
Represented By: Imad Younan Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?