Shannon Campbell Oluwatuyi v. Universal Hospital Services, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Campbell Oluwatuyi
Defendant: Universal Hospital Services, Inc., Does 2 through 100, inclusive and Agiliti Health, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04467
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Shannon Campbell Oluwatuyi.. (Licata, Tara)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Agiliti Health, Inc., Universal Hospital Services, Inc. (Filed in state court 5/21/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Universal Hospital Services, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Shannon Campbell Oluwatuyi. (Filed in state court 4/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Universal Hospital Services, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Declaration #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 05/22/2019. (Mannix, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Universal Hospital Services, Inc., identifying Agiliti, Inc.. (Mannix, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Universal Hospital Services, Inc. identifying Universal Hospital Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Mannix, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Universal Hospital Services, Inc.. (Mannix, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Steven L. Mannix re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Universal Hospital Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mannix, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV12126 Receipt No: 0973-23788746 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Universal Hospital Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Steven Thomas Mannix added to party Universal Hospital Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mannix, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon Campbell Oluwatuyi v. Universal Hospital Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Campbell Oluwatuyi
Represented By: Marcus A Mancini
Represented By: Armando M Solorzano
Represented By: Pamela A Triplett
Represented By: Tara Jennifer Licata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Hospital Services, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Thomas Mannix
Represented By: Lyne A Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agiliti Health, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Thomas Mannix
Represented By: Lyne A Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?