Shawna Cepeda v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shawna Cepeda
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Garfield Beach CVS, LLC
Petitioner: CVS Pharmacy, Inc., a Rhode Island corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04500
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Garfield Beach CVS, LLC Garfield Beach CVS, LLC.(Attorney Marissa Ann Warren added to party Garfield Beach CVS, LLC(pty:dft))(Warren, Marissa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Wrong form used to dismiss a party that has filed an answer. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Shawna Cepeda pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Fiore, Mauro)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc... (Warren, Marissa)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Warren, Marissa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Warren, Marissa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 served on May 23, 2019. (Warren, Marissa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 2. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
May 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Shawna Cepeda. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Shawna Cepeda. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/08/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 2-4 #2 ) (lh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV08159 Receipt No: 0973-23794405 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., a Rhode Island corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Marissa Warren, Esq., #3 Declaration of Melanie Luker, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D) (Attorney Marissa Ann Warren added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc., a Rhode Island corporation(pty:bkmov))(Warren, Marissa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., a Rhode Island corporation, identifying CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attorney Marissa Ann Warren added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc., a Rhode Island corporation(pty:bkmov))(Warren, Marissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawna Cepeda v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Cepeda
Represented By: Mauro Fiore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CVS Pharmacy, Inc., a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Marissa Ann Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa Ann Warren
Represented By: Dennis K Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield Beach CVS, LLC
Represented By: Marissa Ann Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?