Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management Inc.
Defendant: Jonathan Larios, Larios Enterprises, Inc., Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr. and Maritza Larios
Case Number: 2:2019cv04549
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT re: Referral of Action to the Honorable Magistrate Paul L. Abrams filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER/REFERRAL TO ADR by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference between the parties and report are waived pending further order of the court. However, the parties shall, no later than August 19, 2019, provide their Initial Disclosures as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1). All discovery shall be completed on or before January 17, 2020. This case is referred to the ADR Program. Within fourteen (14) days of the filing date of this Order, plaintiff shall contact the ADR Program Director, (213-894-2993), to schedule a mediation. The mediation must be concluded no later than March 17, 2020. (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: ORDER REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE for all necessary discovery and settlement conferences. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by defendant Maritza Larios, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #22 served on 7/11/19. (twdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by defendant Jonathan Larios, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #21 served on 7/11/19. (twdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by defendant Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr., re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #23 served on 7/11/19. (twdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by defendants Jonathan Larios, Maritza Larios, Larios Enterprises, Inc., Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr., re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #24 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #21 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #23 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #22 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #20 served on 7/11/19. (twdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Jonathan Larios, Maritza Larios, Larios Enterprises, Inc., Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr..(shb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr..(shb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Maritza Larios.(shb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jonathan Larios.(shb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Larios Enterprises, Inc. (shb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management Inc., upon Defendant Maritza Larios served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management Inc., upon Defendant Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management Inc., upon Defendant Larios Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management Inc., upon Defendant Jonathan Larios served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jonathon Larios in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Riley, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 19-03, all related Innovative Sports Management, Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Related Group Control Number is CV 11-7395-TJH(PLAx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Larios Enterprises, Inc. (lh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jonathan Larios. (lh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maritza Larios. (lh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr. (lh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Riley, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23802791 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Larios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larios Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Antonio Larios, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritza Larios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?