Ilanit Shoshan et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ilanit Shoshan and Shlomo Shoshan
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, The Bank of New York Mellon and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04576
Filed: May 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: In light of the initial status conference having been vacated and taken off-calendar, the Application to Appear by Telephone #10 and #11 are denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference is vacated and off-calendar. Court Trial is set for October 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m., with a Pretrial Conference on September 30, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Leave of Tony Cara to Appear for Telephonic at Initial Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Ilanit Shoshan, Shlomo Shoshan. Application set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Cara, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Leave of Brian S. Thomley to Appear for by Telephone at Initial Status Conference filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Thomley, Brian)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/8/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04576 SVW (SKx). (esa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
May 27, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Does 1-10, inclusive, The Bank of New York Mellon, filed by plaintiffs Ilanit Shoshan, Shlomo Shoshan. Filed in State Court on 5/24/2019 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 27, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 5/27/2019. (Thomley, Brian)
May 27, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, identifying Bayview Asset Management, LLC, et al.. (Thomley, Brian)
May 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB. (Thomley, Brian)
May 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19VECV00738 Receipt No: 0973-23807087 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB(pty:dft))(Thomley, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ilanit Shoshan et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Brian Scott Thomley
Represented By: William G Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon fka Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-3CB
Represented By: Brian Scott Thomley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Brian Scott Thomley
Represented By: William G Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilanit Shoshan
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shlomo Shoshan
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?