Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Hormoz Michael Eisavi
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Hormoz Michael Eisavi
Case Number: 2:2019cv04590
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: William D Keller
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., upon Defendant Hormoz Michael Eisavi served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edna Eisavi, Sister/Co-Occupant of Defendant in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Babakhani, Edward)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hormoz Michael Eisavi. (lh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hormoz Michael Eisavi. (lh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 19-03, all related Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The Related Group Control Number is CV 07-8296-WDK(Ex). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge William D. Keller and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Babakhani, Edward)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Babakhani, Edward)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Babakhani, Edward)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., identifying None. (Babakhani, Edward)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Babakhani, Edward)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23808205 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attorney Edward Babakhani added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Babakhani, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Hormoz Michael Eisavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormoz Michael Eisavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Babakhani
Represented By: Yasha Bronshteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?