GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund et al v. Tovie Asarese Royal Printing Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund and GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund
Defendant: Tovie Asarese Royal Printing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04655
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tovie Asarese Royal Printing Co., Inc. answer now due 8/14/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund; Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund.(Mindirgasova, Valentina)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund, Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund, upon Defendant Tovie Asarese Royal Printing Co., Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Grace Asarese, administrator, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Answer due 7/15 because an additional 10 days are to be added due to substituted service by mail, pursuant to CCP 415.20 (Mindirgasova, Valentina)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tovie Asarese Royal Printing Co., Inc. (et)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund, GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund, (Mindirgasova, Valentina)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund, GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund. (Mindirgasova, Valentina)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund, GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund. (Mindirgasova, Valentina)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23820581 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund, Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund. (Attorney Valentina S Mindirgasova added to party Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Valentina S Mindirgasova added to party GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund(pty:pla))(Mindirgasova, Valentina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund et al v. Tovie Asarese Royal Printing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tovie Asarese Royal Printing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund
Represented By: Valentina S Mindirgasova
Represented By: Jasleen D Ahuja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GCIU-Employer Retirement Fund
Represented By: Valentina S Mindirgasova
Represented By: Jasleen D Ahuja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?