Gregory Myers v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Gregory Myers
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv04805
Filed: June 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gregory Myers, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/17/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Deborah L. Stachel, Regional Chief Counsel, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel-Region IX. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Koenig, Andrew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (vm)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated 4/21/17) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
June 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gregory Myers, identifying Robert Light. (Koenig, Andrew)
June 2, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gregory Myers. (Koenig, Andrew)
June 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gregory Myers. (Koenig, Andrew)
June 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Gregory Myers. (Koenig, Andrew)
June 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Gregory Myers. (Attorney Andrew Thomas Koenig added to party Gregory Myers(pty:pla))(Koenig, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Myers v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Amanda Schapel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Myers
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?