Enrique Amezcua v. Waste Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Amezcua
Defendant: Western Waste Industries, Waste Management, Inc., Steve Lee, Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Mike Smith, GI Industries and Mandy Parr
Case Number: 2:2019cv04842
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-04842 AB(RAOx). (rn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants GI Industries, Steve Lee, Mandy Parr, Mike Smith, Waste Management, Inc., Western Waste Industries. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-05058-AB-RAO (Dow, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendants GI Industries, Steve Lee, Mandy Parr, Mike Smith, Waste Management, Inc. and Western Waste Industries in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/30/2019, attached as Exhibit O . (jtil)
June 3, 2019 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Enrique Amezcua in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/1/2019, attached as Exhibit N. (jtil)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendants GI Industries, Steve Lee, Mandy Parr, Mike Smith, Waste Management, Inc., Western Waste Industries, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on June 3, 2019. (Dow, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants GI Industries, Steve Lee, Mandy Parr, Mike Smith, Waste Management, Inc., Western Waste Industries identifying Western Waste Industries is a wholly owned subsidiary of Waste Management Holdings, Inc. which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Waste Management Inc.; G.I. Industries is wholly owned subsidiary of Western Waste Industries, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Western Waste Industries, which is wholly owned subsidiary of Waste Mangement Holdings, Inc. which is a wholy owned subsidiary of Waste Management Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Dow, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants GI Industries, Steve Lee, Mandy Parr, Mike Smith, Waste Management, Inc., Western Waste Industries, identifying Plaintiff Enrique Amezcua, Waste Management Inc. - parent of Waste Management Holding, Inc., which is the parent of Western Waste Industries, which is the parent of G.I. Industries, Mike Smith, Steve Lee and Mindy Parr. (Dow, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of David J. Dow re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Declaration of David J. Dow in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendants GI Industries, Steve Lee, Mandy Parr, Mike Smith, Waste Management, Inc., Western Waste Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons and Various notices, #2 Exhibit B - Answers, #3 Exhibit C -Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Exhibit D - First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Joint Stipulation, #6 Exhibit F - Order Granting Stipulation, #7 Exhibit G - Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit H- Defendants' Answer, #9 Exhibit I - Joint Stipulation, #10 Exhibit J - Minute Order, #11 Exhibit K-1 - Ex Parte Application, #12 Exhibit K-2 - Declaration of David Dow, #13 Exhibit K-3 - Proposed Order, #14 Exhibit K-4 - Minute Order, #15 Exhibit L-1 - Notice of MSJ, #16 Exhibit L-2 - MPA iso MSJ, #17 Exhibit L-3 - Req. for Judicial Notice, #18 Exhibit L-4 - Lodgment of Exhibits, #19 Exhibit L-5 - Separate Statement, #20 Exhibit L-6 - Proof of Service, #21 Exhibit L-7 - Notice of Errata, #22 Exhibit M-1 - Joint Ex Parte, #23 Exhibit M-2 - Proposed Order, #24 Exhibit M-3 - Minute Order, #25 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #26 Exhibit O - Answer to TAC, #27 Exhibit P-1 - Case Management Statement, #28 Exhibit P-2 - Case Management Statement, #29 Exhibit P-3 - Notice of CMC, #30 Exhibit P-4 - Case Management Statement, #31 Exhibit P-5 - Notice of Ruling, #32 Exhibit P-6 - Stipulation and Order, #33 Exhibit P-7 - Case Management Statement, #34 Exhibit P-8 - Case Management Statement, #35 Exhibit P-9 - Notice of Case Reassignment and Order)(Dow, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants GI Industries, Steve Lee, Mandy Parr, Mike Smith, Waste Management, Inc., Western Waste Industries. (Dow, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number BC663356 Receipt No: 0973-23852276 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Mike Smith, Western Waste Industries, Mandy Parr, Waste Management, Inc., GI Industries, Steve Lee. (Attorney David J Dow added to party GI Industries (pty:dft), Attorney David J Dow added to party Steve Lee (pty:dft), Attorney David J Dow added to party Mandy Parr(pty:dft), Attorney David J Dow added to party Mike Smith(pty:dft), Attorney David J Dow added to party Waste Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Dow added to party Western Waste Industries (pty:dft))(Dow, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enrique Amezcua v. Waste Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Waste Industries
Represented By: David J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management, Inc.
Represented By: David J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lee
Represented By: David J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Smith
Represented By: David J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GI Industries
Represented By: David J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Parr
Represented By: David J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Amezcua
Represented By: Anthony Nguyen
Represented By: Carney R Shegerian
Represented By: Robert William Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?