Scottsdale Insurance Company v. John Guzman et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Warren E&P, Inc., Warren Resources of California, Inc., John Guzman Crane Service, Alejandro Silva, Jacob Ruben Jimenez, C&S Welding, Inc and John Guzman
Case Number: 2:2019cv04868
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. upon Warren Resources of California, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Waiver of Service signed by A. Eric Aguilera. (Hsu, Linda)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. upon Warren E&P, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Waiver of Service signed by A. Eric Aguilera. (Hsu, Linda)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. upon John Guzman Crane Service waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John Guzman. (Hsu, Linda)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. upon John Guzman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John Guzman. (Hsu, Linda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hsu, Linda)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants C and S Welding, Inc, John Guzman, Jacob Ruben Jimenez, John Guzman Crane Service, Alejandro Silva, Warren E&P, Inc., Warren Resources of California, Inc. (jp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company, identifying Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Hsu, Linda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Hsu, Linda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Hsu, Linda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Hsu, Linda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23858104 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Linda W Hsu added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Hsu, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. John Guzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren E&P, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Resources of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Guzman Crane Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Ruben Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Welding, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda W Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?