Tristin D. King v. Ivan Javregui
Plaintiff: Tristin D. King
Defendant: Ivan Javregui and Ivan Jauregui
Case Number: 2:2019cv04938
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 as to Defendant Ivan Javregui. (ec)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Within thirty days of this order, Plaintiff shall file with the Court a "Notice of Compliance re: Service of Process" with attached copies of the USM-285 form that has been submitted to the United States Marshals Service. (ec)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Upon receipt of this order, the United States Marshal may request that the defendant(s) waive service. If a waiver of service is not returned by a defendant within thirty (30) days of the date of mailing a request for waiver, the United States Marshal shall personally serve process upon that defendant. (ec)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIM AND AMENDING COMPLAINT by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS ORDERED that the equal protection claim alleged in the Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Complaint is so AMENDED. This action shall proceed forward against Defendant Jauregui solely on the basis of the due process claim alleged in the Complaint. The Magistrate Judge shall issue further appropriate orders. (ec)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: SCREENING OF COMPLAINT; AND REQUIRING ACTION by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. For all of the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal or First Amended Complaint or Notice of Intent to Stand on the Complaint, as described above, within 30 days of this Order. (ec)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #2 Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (ec)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Tristin D. King. (esa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Ivan Javregui pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, filed by plaintiff Tristin D. King. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tristin D. King v. Ivan Javregui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristin D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Javregui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Jauregui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?