United States of America v. 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $716,140.00 in U.S. Currency and 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Allen Feldman
Case Number: 2:2019cv04947
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CLAIMANT FELDMAN'S FILING OF CLAIM FORM filed by Claimant 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency. (Richie, Darren)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Warrant for seizure returned executed as to $716,140.00 In U.S. Currency. (jp)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Complaint #1 /Warrant, by Federal statute. Remarks: Seized $716,140.00 (19-DEA-68555, 19-DEA-648556, 19-DEA-648558, 19-DEA-648559) as CV 19-4947 on 07/09/2019. (jp)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency answer now due 8/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Welk, Steven)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on June 17, 2019 and June 18, 2019 upon Defendant 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency last date of publication 7/16/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Welk, Steven)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT for seizure of 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency issued on Complaint #1 . (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum by U.S. Attorney re Magistrate Judge Assignment filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Welk, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff United States of America for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on June 6, 2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Welk, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Welk, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Welk, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Steven R Welk added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Welk, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $716,140.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 716,140.00 USD in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven R Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Allen Feldman
Represented By: Darren Michael Richie
Represented By: Kathleen Mona Gadalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?