Christopher Pina v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Pina
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04956
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Pina.. (Goldsmith, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Christopher Pina.. (Goldsmith, David)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Hearing: Under Submission/No Hearing. Joint Report Due: August 2, 2019. This case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order applies to all parties in this action, whether or not they are represented by counsel. Counsel, as used in this Order, also refers to parties who are representing themselves. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on each defendant, plaintiff shall promptly do so and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Defendant(s) also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. See order for details. (shb)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/5/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 #1 . (et)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Subaru of America, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Pina. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/6/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Jury Demand #4 served on June 6, 2019. (Chinery, Jacqueline)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc... (Chinery, Jacqueline)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc., identifying Subaru Corporation. (Chinery, Jacqueline)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.. (Chinery, Jacqueline)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19GDCV00559 Receipt No: 0973-23878438 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Jacqueline Bruce Chinery added to party Subaru of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chinery, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Pina v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pina
Represented By: David Allan Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline Bruce Chinery
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?