Nomadix, Inc. v. Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.
Plaintiff: Nomadix, Inc.
Defendant: Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04980
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas D Warren counsel for Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. Adding Thomas D. Warren as counsel of record for Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. (Attorney Thomas D Warren added to party Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.(pty:dft))(Warren, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. correcting Reply (Motion related) #34 (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY CORRECTED in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enforcing a forum selection clause in a patent license agreement . Motion #16 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING GUEST-TEK INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LTD.S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL OPPOSITION TO NOMADIXS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. the Court GRANTS the Application. As Guest-Tek has filed a redacted version of the sealed document, only the following portions of the sealed document will not be fully publicly available: (See order for further details) (yl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd., (Fellmeth, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM (vv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enforcing a forum selection clause in a patent license agreement . Motion #16 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd..(Fellmeth, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth G Fellmeth counsel for Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. Adding Elizabeth Grace Fellmeth as counsel of record for Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. (Fellmeth, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin M Bovard on behalf of Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd. (Attorney Kevin M Bovard added to party Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.(pty:dft))(Bovard, Kevin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction under seal #27 filed by Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.'s Brief in Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Kevin Bovard Declaration, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B to Kevin Bovard Declaration)(Fellmeth, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction under seal filed by Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.'s Brief in Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kevin Bovard in Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Kevin Bovard Declaration, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit B to Kevin Bovard Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibits C through G to Kevin Bovard Declaration, #6 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.'s Application for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition)(Fellmeth, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION to file document Brief in Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunection under seal filed by Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.'s Brief in Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.'s Brief in Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.'s Brief in Opposition to Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Fellmeth, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elizabeth G Fellmeth on behalf of Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd. (Attorney Elizabeth G Fellmeth added to party Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.(pty:dft))(Fellmeth, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT - Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lezama in Support of Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #20 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc..(Lezama, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT - Exhibit 1 to Nomadix's Complaint re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #21 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc..(Lezama, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION ON PROPOSED ALTERNATIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO PLAINTIFF NOMADIX'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #19 , it is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd. to file an opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #16 is 6/26/2019. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a reply to such opposition is 7/3/2019. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion is continued to 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr., to take place at the same time as the claim construction hearing in Case No. 2:16-cv-08033. (gk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff Nomadix's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #6 . (gk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff Nomadix's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mark Lezama in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction #14 . (gk) Modified on 6/20/2019 (gk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION for Order Granting Joint Stipulation on Proposed Alternative Briefing Schedule to Plaintiff Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.(pty:dft))(Matthias, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Mark Lezama in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enforcing a forum selection clause in a patent license agreement . Motion #16 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Lezama, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enforcing a forum selection clause in a patent license agreement . Motion #16 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enforcing a forum selection clause in a patent license agreement . Motion filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mark Lezama in Support of Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction under seal #14 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1)(Lezama, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mark Lezama in Support of Nomadix's Motion for Preliminary Injunction under seal filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lezama, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-08033 AB(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04980 AB(FFMx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc., identifying GWHSPV, LLC, f/k/a interTouch Holdings, LLC, Parent company of Nomadix, Inc.; Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC, Parent company of GWHSPV, LLC. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Exhibit 1 to Complaint) under seal #6 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION to file document (Exhibit 1 to Complaint) under seal filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-08033-AB-FFM (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc., identifying interTouch Holdings, LLC, Parent company of Nomadix, Inc.; Gate Worldwide Holdings LLC, Parent company of interTouch Holdings, LLC. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Muehlhauser, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23882745 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nomadix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed sealed) (Attorney Douglas G Muehlhauser added to party Nomadix, Inc.(pty:pla))(Muehlhauser, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nomadix, Inc. v. Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth G Fellmeth
Represented By: Michael R Matthias
Represented By: Kevin M Bovard
Represented By: Thomas D Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nomadix, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G Muehlhauser
Represented By: Mark Lezama
Represented By: Payson LeMeilleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?