Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo v. The United States of America
Petitioner: Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo
Respondent: The United States of America and C. Swain
Case Number: 2:2019cv05126
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for an extension of time to provide Magistrate Judge with a copy of the complaint filed by Petitioner Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo. (et)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The request is GRANTED. #3 (et)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by Petitioner Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo. (sbou)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (cp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas Corpus) - optional html form, #7 (cp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (cp)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO NAME APROPER RESPONDENT by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Petitioner shall correct the name of the Respondent on page 1 of the Petition by naming the Warden of the institution in which he is presently incarcerated instead of the United States of America. Petitioner shall return the corrected Petition to the Court forthwith, but no later than August 18, 2019. (See document for details.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) (sbou)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo. (car)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS COMPELLING THE BUREAU OF PRISONS TO GIVE PETITIONER CREDIT FOR JAIL TIME SPENT IN A FOREIGN PRISON WHILE AWAITING EXTRADITION TO THE UNITED STATES FOR PROSECUTION IN CASE NO. 4:92-CR-270-3 filed against The United States of America, filed by Petitioner Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Petition, #2 Part 3 of Petition, #3 Part 4 of Petition, #4 Part 5 of Petition) (car) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/9/2019) (sbou).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Petitioner Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo. Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action will be dismissed and the file closed. If you submit the CV-60P form or pay the filing fee within THIRTY DAYS, your case will be filed. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged MOTION FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS. (Attachments: #1 CV60P Ifp Request) (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #2 Lodged Motion for a Writ of Mandamus) (et).
June 14, 2019 LODGED MOTION FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS sought to be filed by Petitioner Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julio Cesar Gutierrez-Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Swain
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?