M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc. et al v. VP Racing Fuels, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amber Resources, LLC and M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive, VP Racing Fuels, Inc., Bruce Hendel, Alan B. Cerwick and Susan G. Gray
Case Number: 2:2019cv05154
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 51 COURTESY NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Parties and counsel are advised that traffic around the First Street Courthouse will be impacted by the funeral for LAPD Officer Juan Jose Diaz on Monday, August 12, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. at the Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels (on Temple Street between Grand Avenue and Hill Street). Street closures and heavy congestion should be expected possibly as early as 6:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2019 Filing 50 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Amber Resources, LLC, upon Defendant Bruce Hendel served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bruce Hendel in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Amber Resources, LLC, upon Defendant Susan G. Gray served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan G. Gray in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Amber Resources, LLC, upon Defendant Alan B. Cerwick served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alan B. Cerwick in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Amber Resources, LLC, upon Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon VP Racing Fuels, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #28 filed by Plaintiffs Amber Resources, LLC, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Amber Resources, LLC, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. correcting Reply (Motion related) #44 (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #28 filed by Plaintiffs Amber Resources, LLC, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Robert K. Ashley In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peterson, Glenn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Glenn W. Peterson In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Peterson, Glenn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. (Peterson, Glenn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Susan B. Gray re Reply (Motion related) #38 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 29, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Bruce Hendel re Reply (Motion related) #38 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 29, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. Amendment to Notice of Lodging #36 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Espey, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Espey, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #28 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Glenn)
July 25, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss Case #15 , #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 (Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel) filed by Plaintiffs Amber Resources, LLC, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 (VP Racing Fuels, Inc.) filed by Plaintiffs Amber Resources, LLC, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Susan G. Gray In Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #28 filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Peterson, Glenn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Remand filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. (Peterson, Glenn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Amber Resources, LLC, M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valentine A. Shalamitski and Exhibits A-E) (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Shalamitski, Valentine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Bruce Hendel in support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Susan B. Gray in support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Alan B. Cerwick in support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DEFENDANTS Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. correcting Memorandum in Support of Motion #19 , Notice (Other) #18 (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by DEFENDANTS Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel. (Espey, Richard)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Glenn W. Peterson In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Peterson, Glenn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. (Peterson, Glenn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Peterson, Glenn)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan N. Darnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bruce Hendel, designating Glenn W. Peterson as local counsel #12 . (iv)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Espey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bruce Hendel, designating Glenn W. Peterson as local counsel #11 . (iv)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan N. Darnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bruce Hendel (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/21/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23963658) filed by Defendant Bruce Hendel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn W. Peterson, #2 Proposed Order) (Peterson, Glenn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Espey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bruce Hendel (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/21/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23963597) filed by Defendant Bruce Hendel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn W. Peterson, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Glenn W Peterson added to party Bruce Hendel(pty:dft)) (Peterson, Glenn)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: GRANTING #7 Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Espey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Alan B. Cerwick and Susan G. Gray, designating Glenn W. Peterson as local counsel. The Court did not receive the required word-processing version of the proposed Order by email, or the mandatory copy. See Local Rules and Procedures and Schedules. The Court may strike future filings for non-compliance. (lt)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: GRANTING #8 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan N. Darnell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alan B. Cerwick and Susan G. Gray, designating Glenn W. Peterson as local counsel. The Court did not receive the required word-processing version of the proposed Order by email, or the mandatory copy. See Local Rules and Procedures and Schedules. The Court may strike future filings for non-compliance. (lt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan N. Darnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23963658) filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn W. Peterson, #2 Proposed Order) (Peterson, Glenn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Espey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23963597) filed by Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Susan G. Gray. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn W. Peterson, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Glenn W Peterson added to party Alan B. Cerwick(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn W Peterson added to party Susan G. Gray(pty:dft)) (Peterson, Glenn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant VP Racing Fuels, Inc., (Peterson, Glenn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Alan B. Cerwick, Does 1-100, inclusive, Susan G. Gray, Bruce Hendel, VP Racing Fuels, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc., Amber Resources, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/5/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant VP RACING FUELS, INC.. (Peterson, Glenn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV19662 Receipt No: 0973-23913950 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant VP RACING FUELS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Complains, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Case Assignment) (Attorney Glenn W Peterson added to party VP RACING FUELS, INC.(pty:dft))(Peterson, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc. et al v. VP Racing Fuels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Resources, LLC
Represented By: Stephen E Foster
Represented By: Valentine A Shalamitski
Represented By: Hayward J Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.O. Dion and Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E Foster
Represented By: Valentine A Shalamitski
Represented By: Hayward J Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VP Racing Fuels, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W Peterson
Represented By: Robert K Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Hendel
Represented By: Jonathan N Darnell
Represented By: Richard W Espey
Represented By: Glenn W Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan B. Cerwick
Represented By: Jonathan N Darnell
Represented By: Richard W Espey
Represented By: Glenn W Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan G. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan N Darnell
Represented By: Richard W Espey
Represented By: Glenn W Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?