Quanzhou One Plus One Housewares Co., Ltd et al v. Akiva Nourollah et al
Plaintiff: Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd and Quanzhou One Plus One Housewares Co., Ltd
Defendant: OxGord, Inc., Akiva Nourollah, Day To Day Imports, Inc and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv05162
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Day To Day Imports, Inc, Akiva Nourollah, OxGord, Inc., identifying Defendants Day To Day Imports, Inc., Oxgord Incorporated, and Akiva Nourollah as interested parties. (Kaufman, Aryeh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Day To Day Imports, Inc, Akiva Nourollah, OxGord, Inc..(Kaufman, Aryeh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Day To Day Imports, Inc answer now due 7/31/2019; OxGord, Inc. answer now due 7/31/2019; Akiva Nourollah answer now due 7/31/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Day To Day Imports, Inc; OxGord, Inc.; Akiva Nourollah.(Attorney Aryeh L Kaufman added to party Day To Day Imports, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Aryeh L Kaufman added to party Akiva Nourollah(pty:dft), Attorney Aryeh L Kaufman added to party OxGord, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaufman, Aryeh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Housewares Co., Ltd, upon Defendant Day To Day Imports, Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019; Akiva Nourollah acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019; OxGord, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Aryeh Kaufman, Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ni, Angus)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Day To Day Imports, Inc. (mrgo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Akiva Nourollah. (mrgo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant OxGord, Inc. (mrgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Housewares Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 summons request, #2 summons request)(Ni, Angus)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed summons forms are blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 summons request, #2 summons request)(Ni, Angus)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #4 Non-Resident Attorney Angus F. Ni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Housewares Co Ltd, designating Zinlin L. Morrow as local counsel. (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Angus F. Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23916027) filed by Plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrow, Xinlin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice And Certification of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd, (Morrow, Xinlin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd. (Morrow, Xinlin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23915683 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd. (Attorney Xinlin Morrow added to party Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd(pty:pla))(Morrow, Xinlin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quanzhou One Plus One Housewares Co., Ltd et al v. Akiva Nourollah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OxGord, Inc.
Represented By: Aryeh L Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akiva Nourollah
Represented By: Aryeh L Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day To Day Imports, Inc
Represented By: Aryeh L Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanzhou One Plus One Houswares Co., Ltd
Represented By: Xinlin Morrow
Represented By: Angus Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanzhou One Plus One Housewares Co., Ltd
Represented By: Xinlin Morrow
Represented By: Angus Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?