In Re: Aleksandr Goldshtadt
Not Yet Classified: Aleksandr Goldshtadt
Appellant: Zack King
Appellee: Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo and Brill L.L.P and Howard M. Ehrenberg
Case Number: 2:2019cv05169
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE PENDING APPEALS OF SAME BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER FOR ALL PURPOSES #11 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The Stipulation is APPROVED. 2. The Appeals are consolidated for all purposes, including, but notlimited to, with respect to all briefing, with the low-numbered First Appeal (CaseNo. 2:19-cv-05116-CAS) (as defined in the Stipulation) designated as the lead, consolidated appeal (the Consolidated Appeal). 3. All motions, briefs, pleadings, and other papers for both Appeals shall be filed in the Consolidated Appeal only. 4. The Second Appeal (as defined in the Stipulation) bearing Case No. 2:19-cv-05169-CAS shall be, and hereby is, closed. 5. Briefing in the Consolidated Appeal shall proceed on a single schedule on a single track. Notwithstanding any previous briefing schedule in either of the Appeals: (a) Appellants in the Consolidated Appeal shall file their opening appeal briefs no later than August 31, 2019; (b) Appellees in the Consolidated Appeal shall file their responsive appeal briefs no later than October 7, 2019; and (c) any reply briefs in the Consolidated Appeal shall be filed no later than October 21, 2019. (lom)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:19-cv-05169 and 2:19-cv-05116 filed by Appellee Howard M. Ehrenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wu, Claire)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-05116 CAS. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05169 CAS. Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 7/29/2019. (mrgo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #1 . (mrgo)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Transcript not filed forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellant Zack King. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05116-CAS (Tilem, David)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 6/11/2019. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order granting chapter 7 trustees Motion for Order: (1) Approving Settlement Agreement Between Chapter 7 Trustee and Sylvia and Anthony Nicoletti; (2) Finding Settlement Agreement was Negotiated, Entered, and Proposed in Good Faith Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363(m)... entered on 5/09/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Sandra R. Klein, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 5/29/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:15-bk-12692-SK, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC-19-1141., filed by Appellant Zack King. (Attachments: #1 BAP Docket) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Aleksandr Goldshtadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Aleksandr Goldshtadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zack King
Represented By: David A Tilem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo and Brill L.L.P
Represented By: Lindsey L Smith
Represented By: David B Golubchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Howard M. Ehrenberg
Represented By: Daniel A Lev
Represented By: Claire Karen Wu
Represented By: Asa S Hami
Represented By: Assaf S Hami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?