Malik Lawrence v. Loews Hollywood Hotel, LLC

Plaintiff: MALIK LAWRENCE
Defendant: LOEWS HOLLYWOOD HOTEL, LLC and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05171
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Initial Pleadings and Service-Answers to Complaints. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Answer to Complaint (Discovery) filed by Defendant Loews Hollywood Hotel, LLC. (Demerjian, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Assignment to United States Judges and General Order filed by Defendant Loews Hollywood Hotel, LLC. (Demerjian, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties should have been filed under a separate events, not as attachments to the removal. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 NON CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Loews Hollywood Hotel, LLC, attached as Exhibit C.(jtil)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Malik Lawrence in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/16/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LASC, case number 19STCV13281 Receipt No: 0973-23916445 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant LOEWS HOLLYWOOD HOTEL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration) (Attorney James H Demerjian added to party LOEWS HOLLYWOOD HOTEL, LLC(pty:dft))(Demerjian, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malik Lawrence v. Loews Hollywood Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIK LAWRENCE
Represented By: Raymond Babaian
Represented By: Melissa Paulette Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOEWS HOLLYWOOD HOTEL, LLC
Represented By: James H Demerjian
Represented By: Richard S Rosenberg
Represented By: David J Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?