Chariesse Holloway v. Regus Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chariesse Holloway
Defendant: Regus Management Group, LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC and DOES 1 through 20 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05185
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/21/2020. Joint status report re settlement due by 8/28/2020. (et)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court has scheduled the dates set forth on the last page of this Order after review of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Therefore, the Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (gk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 PARTIES' JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(F) filed by Defendant Regus Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Shankman, David)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney David S Shankman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regus Business Centre LLC and Regus Management Group, LLC, designating Jerry J Chang as local counsel. (lom)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David S. Shankman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24046180) filed by Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Jerry)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC.(Gatley, Steven)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 6/17/2019. (Gatley, Steven)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 served on 6/17/2019. (Gatley, Steven)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Chariesse Holloway, upon Defendant Regus Business Centre LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Santara-Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 4 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Chariesse Holloway, upon Defendant Regus Management Group, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Santara-Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC., Does 1 through 20 inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Chariesse Holloway. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/4/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 6/13/2019. (Gatley, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC, identifying Regus Management Group, LLC and Regus Business Centre, LLC. (Gatley, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC. (Gatley, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV07093 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 06/13/2019, receipt number 26I4M8GA), filed by Defendants Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jerry Chang in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Los Angeles Superior Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service as to Mike Osborn, #4 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Service as to Regus Management Group, LLC, #5 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service as to Regus Business Centre LLC, #6 Declaration of Michael Osburn in Support of Notice of Removal, #7 Declaration of Sharon Edmondson in Support of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Steven G Gatley added to party Regus Business Centre LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Steven G Gatley added to party Regus Management Group, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Gatley, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chariesse Holloway v. Regus Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chariesse Holloway
Represented By: James Eugene Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regus Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Steven G Gatley
Represented By: David S Shankman
Represented By: Jerry J Chang
Represented By: Tiffany H Rouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regus Business Centre LLC
Represented By: Steven G Gatley
Represented By: David S Shankman
Represented By: Jerry J Chang
Represented By: Tiffany H Rouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?