Antonio Fernandez v. Brothers Auto Repair, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Brothers Auto Repair, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv05194
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Brother's Auto Repair, Inc (jp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Brothers Auto Repair, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
July 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Brothers Auto Repair, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: GUADALUPE ALVAREZ in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Brothers Auto Repair, Inc. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919185 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. Brothers Auto Repair, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Auto Repair, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?