Chris Langer v. Micaela Barraza et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Crown Paint, Inc. and Micaela Barraza
Case Number: 2:2019cv05195
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Micaela Barraza(in individual ) served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Viktor (Doe)-Person in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before August 26, 2019. (iv)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Micaela Barraza(representative capacity as trustee of the Micaela Barraza Family Trust Dated November 1, 2000), Micaela Barraza(in individual ), Crown Paint, Inc., (Tello, Guillermo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Micaela Barraza(representative capacity as trustee of the Micaela Barraza Family Trust Dated November 1, 2000), Micaela Barraza(in individual ), Crown Paint, Inc..(Attorney Guillermo Marquez Tello added to party Micaela Barraza(pty:dft), Attorney Guillermo Marquez Tello added to party Micaela Barraza(pty:dft), Attorney Guillermo Marquez Tello added to party Crown Paint, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tello, Guillermo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Crown Paint, Inc. served on 7/4/2019, answer due 7/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Viktor (DOE)-Person in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Micaela Barraza(representative capacity as trustee of the Micaela Barraza Family Trust Dated November 1, 2000), Micaela Barraza(in individual ), Crown Paint, Inc. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919193 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. Micaela Barraza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Paint, Inc.
Represented By: Guillermo Marquez Tello
Represented By: Marina Samson
Represented By: Rafael G Nendel-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micaela Barraza
Represented By: Guillermo Marquez Tello
Represented By: Marina Samson
Represented By: Rafael G Nendel-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?