Taylor Pantel et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Ruggeri, John McLeod, Scott Trump, Andrea Tevini, Craig Sparks, Mathew Storckman, Edward Scott, Fred Ortiz, Amoreena McCoy, Spencer White, Brent Topie, Robert Williams, John White, Michael McCoy, Simon Smith, Bear Scharbarth, Kimberly Terry, Ashley Miller, Charles Young, Catherine Rhode, Nielsen Tauoa, John Wilcox, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Mark Robb, Sahn Sirivong, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryce Monteleone, John Spencer, Mike Miliotti, Julie Vonada, Chris McCoy, Ace McFarlin, Kimberly Topie, Scott Mcanally, Jerry Pettes, Varun Sharma, Janice McWhorter, James Robertson, Nicole Topie, Javier Soto, Eugene Raschke, Denise Peabody, David Oakley, Frank Vonada, Bryan Terry, Robert Topie, Sam Peterson, Rob Sauser, Juan Sanchez, Carey Wishon, Joedy Muha, Janel Young, Andrew Smith, Rick Russell, Edward Schultz, Joe Wehrle, Britney Smith, Linda Meske, Trevor Pierson, John Sujishi, Marv Meske, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Terry Rhode, Dina Ranson, Gerry Trias, Joey Mendoza, Derek Ranson, Carlos Papion, Dale Peabody, Matthew Nattenberg, Alvis McWhorter, Denise Oakley, Taylor Pantel, Chad Smith, William Reeder, Janet Smith, Brenda Solties, Robin Raschke, Steven Smith, Dominc Patino, Billy Perkins, Robert Nichols, Donna Miliotti, Flor Trias, Sam Neer, Amit Sharma, Rick Solties, Lisa Reeder, Dianne Pettes, Kathryn Wilcox and Jennifer Perkins
Defendant: General Motors LLC, Merle Stone Chevrolet, Robert Bosch Gmbh, Rally Auto Group, Inc. and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05211
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominc Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Miller, Charles)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of R. Smith in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proof of Service) (Smith, Renee)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LlC, designating Robyn E. Bladow as local counsel. (lt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/19/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23948088) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bladow, Robyn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23948088) #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by July 3, 2019. In addition to the errors noted in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies (Docket No 16), the application is not hand-signed (see Local Rule 5-4.3.4). The amended application must cure all defects. (lt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23948088) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): No state court/bar listed. (lt)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND REMAND MOTION #11 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For any defendant who has been properly served as of the date on which Plaintiffs' anticipated motion to remand is decided, the due date to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until 30 days after a ruling on Plaintiffs' anticipated motion to remand. (iv)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 ** STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS DATED 6/20/19 ** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23948088) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bladow, Robyn) Modified on 6/21/2019 (lt).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-05211 MWF(KSx). (rn)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-05205 CAS(KSx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 2:19-cv-05211 CAS(KSx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (rn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Remand Motion filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bladow, Robyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05205 (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/10/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice (Other) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 served on June 14, 2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow counsel for Defendant General Motors LLC. Adding Robyn E. Bladow as counsel of record for General Motors LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant General Motors LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 7.1 and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. of Pendency of Other Actions Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.4.1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19LBCV00300 Receipt No: 0973-23923006 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Bladow, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Pantel et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ruggeri
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McLeod
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Trump
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Tevini
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Sparks
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Storckman
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Scott
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Ortiz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amoreena McCoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer White
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John White
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bear Scharbarth
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Terry
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Miller
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Young
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Rhode
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nielsen Tauoa
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilcox
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Dickson Nichols
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Robb
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahn Sirivong
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Shehan
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Monteleone
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Spencer
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Miliotti
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Vonada
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McCoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace McFarlin
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mcanally
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Pettes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varun Sharma
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice McWhorter
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robertson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Soto
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Raschke
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Peabody
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oakley
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Vonada
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Terry
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Peterson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Sauser
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Sanchez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Wishon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joedy Muha
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janel Young
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Russell
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Schultz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Wehrle
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britney Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Meske
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Pierson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sujishi
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marv Meske
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Perez-Ortiz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Rhode
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Ranson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Trias
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Mendoza
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Ranson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Papion
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Peabody
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Nattenberg
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvis McWhorter
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Oakley
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Pantel
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Reeder
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Solties
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Raschke
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominc Patino
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Perkins
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nichols
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Miliotti
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Trias
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Neer
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amit Sharma
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Solties
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Reeder
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Pettes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Wilcox
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Perkins
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Robyn Eileen Bladow
Represented By: Renee D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merle Stone Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch Gmbh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rally Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?