United States of America v. Approximately 205,850 Plastic Bags
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately 205,850 Plastic Bags
Case Number: 2:2019cv05218
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
2 Judge: Fernando M Olguin
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 6/24/19 and 6/25/19 upon Defendant Approximately 205,850 Plastic Bags last date of publication 7/23/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Publication was made in the official government website www.forfeiture.gov. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-02740 FMO(MAAx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05218 FMO(MAAx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPOINTING DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE by Judge George H. Wu re: #6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian. (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT for seizure of Approximately 205,850 Plastic Bags issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-02740 (Sew Hoy, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection in place of the United States Marshal filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sew Hoy, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum re Magistrate Judge Conflict filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Sew Hoy, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 06/14/2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Sew Hoy, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately 205,850 Plastic Bags
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 205,850 Plastic Bags
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Raymond Sew Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?