Clifford Douglas v. Mary Duda et al
Plaintiff: Clifford Douglas
Defendant: Does 1 to 5, inclusive, Laura Craig, Chae DeLeon and Mary Duda
Case Number: 2:2019cv05236
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19SMUD00600, acknowledged on 6/21/2019. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (iv)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Laura Craig. (car)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Laura Craig (car)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, case number 19SMUD00600 with Conformed copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish., filed by plaintiff Clifford Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford Douglas v. Mary Duda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 5, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chae DeLeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Duda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Douglas
Represented By: Eric Meller
Represented By: Harry E Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?