Mary Atamian v. Aegle Nutrition, LLC
Plaintiff: Miray Atamian
Defendant: Aegle Nutrition, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05247
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINE AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 #14 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for class certification shall be determined at a future scheduling conference in this matter. (lom)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Barthel, Nicholas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC (Lopez, E)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC, identifying Miray Atamian. (Lopez, E)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aegle Nutrition, LLC answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC.(Attorney E Crystal Lopez added to party Aegle Nutrition, LLC(pty:dft))(Lopez, E)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05247 SVW(PLAx). (rn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian, upon Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marissa Amaya, Person in Charge to John Ramsey as Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Barthel, Nicholas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC. (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian, identifying AEGLE NUTRITION, LLC, TROPICAL OASIS. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23926971 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Miray Atamian(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mary Atamian v. Aegle Nutrition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegle Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: E Crystal Lopez
Represented By: Joshua M Briones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miray Atamian
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Nicholas Barthel
Represented By: Jason A Ibey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?