Dieter Hartmann v. Tyler Bates et al
Plaintiff: Dieter Hartmann
Defendant: Tyler Bates Music, Inc., Tyler Bates, Focus Features, LLC and Focus Features Productions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05273
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-6 days, filed by Plaintiff Dieter Hartmann.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule Worksheet)(Juenger, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Tyler Bates, Tyler Bates Music, Inc., identifying ThinkRisk. (Johnson, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Tyler Bates, Tyler Bates Music, Inc..(Attorney Edward Eric Johnson added to party Tyler Bates(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Eric Johnson added to party Tyler Bates Music, Inc.(pty:dft))(Johnson, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Focus Features Productions, LLC, Focus Features, LLC, identifying Comcast Corporation. (Anderson, Peter)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendants Focus Features Productions, LLC, Focus Features, LLC.(Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party Focus Features Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party Focus Features, LLC(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Dieter Hartmann. (Juenger, John)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-08863 AB (MRWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05273 AB (MRWx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (esa)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Dieter Hartmann. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-08863 (Juenger, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dieter Hartmann. (Juenger, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dieter Hartmann, identifying Tyler Bates, Tyler Bates Music, Inc., Focus Features, LLC, Focus Features Productions, LLC. (Juenger, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23932228 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dieter Hartmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney John F Juenger added to party Dieter Hartmann(pty:pla))(Juenger, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dieter Hartmann v. Tyler Bates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dieter Hartmann
Represented By: John F Juenger
Represented By: Alan S Gutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Bates Music, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Eric Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Bates
Represented By: Edward Eric Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Features, LLC
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Features Productions, LLC
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?