Patrick J. Reiten, MD FACS v. Blue Cross of California et al
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Reiten MD FACS, a California corporation and Patrick J. Reiten, MD FACS
Defendant: BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS, Blue Cross of California and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05274
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #13 filed by Plaintiff Patrick J. Reiten, MD FACS. (Boydston, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Blue Cross of California. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathi Loppnow, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Allison, Steven)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Blue Cross of California, served on 06/21/2019. (Mahmoud, Samrah)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Percy Anderson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-07433 PA(PLAx) (rn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Blue Cross of California answer now due 7/24/2019, filed by Defendant Blue Cross of California.(Mahmoud, Samrah)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Blue Cross of California, Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Patrick J. Reiten, MD FACS. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/7/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 2) (ghap)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV16014 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 06/17/2019, receipt number 0973-23932434), filed by Defendant BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Kathi Loppnow ISO Notice of Removal)(Mahmoud, Samrah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Mahmoud, Samrah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-07433-PA-PLA (Mahmoud, Samrah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS, identifying Anthem, Inc.; Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Co.. (Mahmoud, Samrah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Mahmoud, Samrah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV16014 Receipt No: 0973-23932434 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Kathi Loppnow ISO Notice of Removal) (Attorney Samrah R Mahmoud added to party BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS(pty:dft))(Mahmoud, Samrah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick J. Reiten, MD FACS v. Blue Cross of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Reiten MD FACS, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Reiten, MD FACS
Represented By: Brian D Boydston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS
Represented By: Samrah R Mahmoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Represented By: Samrah R Mahmoud
Represented By: Steven D Allison
Represented By: Jordan Kevin Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?