Sara Woehrle v. AMN Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Sara Woehrle
Defendant: AMN Services, LLC, DOES 1-20 inclusive and Providence Health System-Southern California
Case Number: 2:2019cv05282
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants AMN Services, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Sara Woehrle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Opt-in consent form to join this lawsuit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - PAGA Notice Letter Pursuant to California Labor Code 2699)(Koulloukian, Nazo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File /Set a Schedule for Plaintiff Woehrle to File a First Amended Complaint and for Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California.(Mackay, Aimee)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Set a Schedule for Plaintiff Sara Woehrle to File a First Amended Complaint and for Defendant AMN Services, LLC to Respond to First Amended Complaint #18 (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Set a Schedule for Plaintiff Sara Woehrle to File a First Amended Complaint and for Defendant AMN Services, LLC to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AMN Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation, #2 Proof of Service)(Kroll-Rosenbaum, Sarah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Providence Health System-Southern California answer now due 8/2/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California.(Mackay, Aimee)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California, identifying Providence Health & Services. (Mackay, Aimee)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aimee G Mackay counsel for Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California. Adding Aimee Mackay as counsel of record for Providence Health System-Southern California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California. (Attorney Aimee G Mackay added to party Providence Health System-Southern California(pty:dft))(Mackay, Aimee)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anahi Gonzalez counsel for Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California. Adding Anahi Gonzalez as counsel of record for Providence Health System-Southern California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California. (Attorney Anahi Gonzalez added to party Providence Health System-Southern California(pty:dft))(Gonzalez, Anahi)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Douglas Roger Hart counsel for Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California. Adding Douglas R. Hart as counsel of record for Providence Health System-Southern California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Providence Health System-Southern California. (Attorney Douglas Roger Hart added to party Providence Health System-Southern California(pty:dft))(Hart, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AMN Services, LLC answer now due 7/26/2019, filed by defendant AMN Services, LLC.(Kroll-Rosenbaum, Sarah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AMN Services, LLC, Certificate of Service and Filing of Notice to Plaintiff and Clerk of the Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to USDC served on June 17, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kroll-Rosenbaum, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-04132 DSF(KSx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05282 DSF(KSx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Matthew Aaron Scholl and Nancy Sotomayor to Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum. filed by Defendant AMN Services, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kroll-Rosenbaum, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Nancy Sotomayor counsel for Defendant AMN Services, LLC. Changing firm name and address to Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete LLP, 2029 Century Park East, Suite 1100, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Changing e-mail, telephone and fax numbers to nsotomayor@constangy.com; T. (310) 909-7775; F. (424) 465-6630. Filed by defendant AMN Services, LLC. (Sotomayor, Nancy)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Sara Woehrle in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/2/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AMN Services, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AMN Services, LLC identifying AMN Healthcare, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kroll-Rosenbaum, Sarah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AMN Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kroll-Rosenbaum, Sarah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV15213 Receipt No: 0973-23933970 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant AMN Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Larson, #2 Declaration of Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum added to party AMN Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Kroll-Rosenbaum, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sara Woehrle v. AMN Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMN Services, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nancy Sotomayor
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Scholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health System-Southern California
Represented By: Douglas Roger Hart
Represented By: Aimee G Mackay
Represented By: Anahi Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Woehrle
Represented By: Ashkan Y Shakouri
Represented By: Nazo Leon Koulloukian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?