Klauber Brothers, Inc v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc
Defendant: Big Strike LLC, Does 1 through 10, Target Corporation and Does through 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv05286
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On July 19, 2019, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on August 14, 2019. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Target Corporation, identifying TARGET CORPORATION, a Minnesota Corporation. (Seror, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Attorney Matthew Lawrence Seror added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft))(Seror, Matthew)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RESPONSE DEADLINE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On July 19, 2019, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution as to Target Corporation. In light of Plaintiff's response to the Order to Show Cause, the Court CONTINUES the Order to Show Cause response deadline to September 3, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Incto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 (Burroughs, Scott)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 8/2/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) Target Corporation did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc, upon Defendant Target Corporation served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service c/o Albert Damonte, Person Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Big Strike LLC, Target Corporation. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc, (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23935060 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Strike LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Seror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?