Randy Rhoads v. Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Randy Rhoads
Defendant: Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc. and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05329
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19STCV11065, acknowledged on 8/15/2019. (iv)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court State of CA, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court State of CA, County of Los Angeles. (lom)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The Court orders as follows: 1. The Parties' stipulation is approved; 2. Central District of California case number 2:19-cv-05329 JFW (JPRx) styled RANDY RHOADS V. WESTERN REFRIGERATED FREIGHT SYSTEMS, INC. et al. is hereby remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lom)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Tali Shaddow RE COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Plaintiff Randy Rhoads. (Shaddow, Tali)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Randy Rhoads, (Shaddow, Tali)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 First STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Worsinger, Laura)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Laura P. Worsinger re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc.. (Worsinger, Laura)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on June 25, 2019. (Jones, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc..(Jones, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 29, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 15, 2019. (iv)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on June 18, 2019 (Notice of Removal with supporting documentation) and June 19, 2019 (Notice of Assignment/ADR Notice). (Worsinger, Laura)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
June 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by First Class Mail of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Randy Rhoads, upon Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-9) (lh)
June 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc., Does 1 through 20. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Randy Rhoads. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/20/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-4 #1 ) (lh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc., (Jones, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc. (Jones, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc.. (Jones, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV11065 Receipt No: 0973-23943084 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex B Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum, #3 Exhibit Ex C Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex D Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex E Notice of CM Conference, #6 Exhibit Ex F Rhoads CMC Statement, #7 Exhibit Ex G Notice Case Assignment, #8 Exhibit Ex H Notice of CMC Conference, #9 Exhibit Ex I POS by mail) (Attorney Gregory Kent Jones added to party Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc. (pty:dft))(Jones, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randy Rhoads v. Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Rhoads
Represented By: Tali H Shaddow
Represented By: Mark Steven Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Refrigerated Freight Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Kent Jones
Represented By: Laura P Worsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?