Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists v. Knights of Badassdom Production I, LLC
Petitioner: Counsel Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists and Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Respondent: Knights of Badassdom Production I, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05350
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Judgment,,,, #13 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #12 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 11 served on July 23, 2019. (Kokish, Iris)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: 1. The Arbitration Award in favor of Petitioner and against respondent Knights of Badassdom Production I, LLC ("Respondent"), Union Case No. 11989, dated August 7, 2018 is confirmed in all respects; 2. Respondent is ordered to pay to Petitioner: (a) The sum of $257,936.61 as directed by the Arbitration Award; (b) $2,400 in attorneys fees incurred by Petitioner in this action; and (c) $400.00 in costs incurred by Petitioner in this action; 3. Petitioner is hereby granted an assignment of Respondent's accounts receivable from the distribution, exhibition, exploitation, or other use of the motion picture entitled Knights of Badassdom anywhere in the world until the amounts due are paid in full; 4. Petitioner is authorized to engage in any of the remedial actions provided for in the parties' Security Agreement; and 5. The parties are to split any arbitrator fees. The Clerk is ordered to enter this Judgment. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bm)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: MOTION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH #1 : For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Petitioner's Motion for Order Confirming Arbitration and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith (Docket No. 1). The Court will issue a Judgment consistent with this Order. (see document for further details) (bm)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION for Order Confirming Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith 7 currently set for hearing on July 22, 2019 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Order #9 served on June 25, 2019. (Kokish, Iris)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Text Only Notice (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on June 20, 2019. (Kokish, Iris)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion For Order Confirming Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 19, 2019. (Kokish, Iris)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, (Kokish, Iris)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Kokish, Iris)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF IRIS R. KOKISH IN SUPPORT THEREOF Receipt No: 0973-23946115 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Judgment) (Attorney Iris R Kokish added to party Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists(pty:pet))(Kokish, Iris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists v. Knights of Badassdom Production I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Knights of Badassdom Production I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Counsel Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Represented By: Iris R Kokish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Represented By: Iris R Kokish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?