Andrea Allen v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Plaintiff: Andrea Allen
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp
Case Number: 2:2019cv05363
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 Text Entry Order denying APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #20 for the reasons stated in the clerk's Notice to Filer of Deficiencies []22]. Counsel may correct and refile or file a request for refund of any fees paid. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before The Pretrial Conference is set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The hearing on July 29, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 27, 2020. (yl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Murphy, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Rachel Suzanne Rubenstein on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corp. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff Andrea Allen Victor A. Russo (Petru, Anthony)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corp, (Murphy, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corp.(Attorney Michael E Murphy added to party National Railroad Passenger Corp(pty:dft))(Murphy, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 29, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 15, 2019. (iv)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Suzanne Rubenstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:19-cv-3538-LTS-KNF, from Southern District of New York (Foley Square). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-5363-JFW (MRWx). (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Southern
June 19, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Central District of California (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff Andrea Allen and Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corp. ("Amtrak") that the above-entitled action be and the same hereby is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that facsimile signatures will be deemed as originals for the purpose of filing this stipulation with the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/19/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Rubenstein, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Suzanne Rubenstein on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Rubenstein, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. National Railroad Passenger Corp. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. Document filed by Andrea Allen. (Wietzke, Marc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/30/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
April 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea Allen. (Wietzke, Marc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16741032)Document filed by Andrea Allen.(Wietzke, Marc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrea Allen v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Allen
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Represented By: Marc T Wietzke
Represented By: Victor A Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp
Represented By: Rachel Suzanne Rubenstein
Represented By: Ralph F Popelar, Jr
Represented By: Brock B Christensen
Represented By: Michael E Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?