Antonio Fernandez v. Celina Pinedo et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Salvador Pinedo, Does 1-10 and Celina Pinedo
Case Number: 2:2019cv05386
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Salvador Pinedo served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Celina Pinedo served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE filed by Defendants Celina Pinedo, Salvador Pinedo. (Campbell, Warren)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Celina Pinedo, Salvador Pinedo.(Attorney Warren B Campbell added to party Celina Pinedo(pty:dft), Attorney Warren B Campbell added to party Salvador Pinedo(pty:dft))(Campbell, Warren)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 8 served on 7/13/2019. (Carson, Chris)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Celina Pinedo, Salvador Pinedo. (car)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23953839 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. Celina Pinedo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Pinedo
Represented By: Warren B Campbell
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celina Pinedo
Represented By: Warren B Campbell
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?