Iglesias v. Touchpoint 360, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria A. Iglesias and Robert Graycloud
Defendant: Touchpoint 360, LLC and E.A. Langenfeld Assocs., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05396
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AND NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (yl)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Edmond S. Moreland APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Maria A. Iglesias, designating Matthew S. Parmet as local counsel. (yl)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edmond S. Moreland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24100165) filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join, #2 Proposed Order) (Parmet, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Consent to Join filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join)(Parmet, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant E.A. Langenfeld Assocs., Ltd.. (lom)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Touchpoint 360, LLC. (lom)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Parmet, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Parmet, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 , Summons Request #10 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Name of the defendant must be the same as on the complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Parmet, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Parmet, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Parmet, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Parmet, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias, (Parmet, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Parmet, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23955367 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Maria A. Iglesias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet added to party Maria A. Iglesias(pty:pla))(Parmet, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iglesias v. Touchpoint 360, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touchpoint 360, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.A. Langenfeld Assocs., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria A. Iglesias
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Graycloud
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?